Global Patent Index - EP 1093145 A1

EP 1093145 A1 2001-04-18 - Control mechanism for a circuit breaker

Title (en)

Control mechanism for a circuit breaker

Title (de)

Bedienungsmechanismus für Lastschalter

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de commande de disjoncteur

Publication

EP 1093145 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402771 A

Priority

FR 9912793 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit breaker command has a manual stop button set (40b) and release (40c) and an electromagnetic release (41) operating a pivoting lever (67) and second command pivot (66) releasing a spring release (65). A trip mechanism (64) mounted on the axis (05) is coupled to the manual command exercising the spring release in a first setting and a command lever opening in a second position.

Abstract (fr)

Mécanisme de disjoncteur comprenant une partie 40a à commande manuelle sollicitée par un bouton 42 et une partie 40c à déclencheur électromagnétique de surintensité 41 et ressort de déclenchement 65. Les parties 40b,40c agissent sur un levier commun 43 respectivement par l'intermédiaire d'une biellette 62 et d'un levier de commande 66. La partie 40b est couplée à un levier 64 sur lequel le ressort 65 exerce d'un côté un couple, tout en appliquant de l'autre côté un couple d'ouverture sur le levier 66. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/56; H01H 73/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 73/30 (2006.01); H01H 71/56 (2006.01); H01H 73/12 (2006.01); H01H 73/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/56 (2013.01); H01H 73/42 (2013.01); H01H 89/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093145 A1 20010418; EP 1093145 B1 20060419; DE 60027382 D1 20060524; DE 60027382 T2 20070201; FR 2799573 A1 20010413; FR 2799573 B1 20011214; JP 2001148221 A 20010529; JP 4454823 B2 20100421; US 6307455 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161014

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160902

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070122

2006-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60027382 P 20060524

2006-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2006-04-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060419

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DOLO, GERARD

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MILLOT, DOMINIQUE

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOIROT, FREDERIC

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001213

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI