Global patent index - EP 1093148 A1

EP 1093148 A1 2001-04-18 - Plasma display device

Title (en)

Plasma display device

Title (de)

Plasma-Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage à plasma

Publication

EP 1093148 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00402827 A

Priority

JP 28963799 A

Abstract (en)

An alternate-current driven type plasma display device comprises; (a) a first panel comprising a first substrate; an electrode group constituted of a plurality of electrodes; and a dielectric layer, and (b) a second panel comprising a second substrate; fluorescent layers; and ribs, wherein a pair of the opposed electrodes comprises; (A) a first main wiring (12A), (B) a second main wiring (12B) extending in parallel with the first main wiring (12A), (C) a first branch electrode (13A) which extends between the adjacent ribs (25), extends from the first main wiring (12A) toward the second main wiring (12B) and extends short of the second main wiring (12B), and (D) a second branch electrode (13B) which extends between the adjacent ribs (25), extends from the second main wiring (12B) toward the first main wiring (12A) and extends short of the first main wiring (12A) such that the second branch electrode (13B) is opposed to the first branch electrode (13A), and discharging being to take place between the first branch electrode (13A) and the second branch electrode (13B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/49

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2012.01); H01J 11/14 (2012.01); H01J 11/22 (2012.01); H01J 11/24 (2012.01); H01J 11/26 (2012.01); H01J 11/34 (2012.01); H04N 5/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/24 (2013.01); H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 11/32 (2013.01); H01J 2211/245 (2013.01); H01J 2211/323 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093148 A1 20010418; CN 1308358 A 20010815; JP 2001110324 A 20010420; KR 20010067319 A 20010712; TW 466527 B 20011201

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040429

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI