Global Patent Index - EP 1093195 A1

EP 1093195 A1 2001-04-18 - Electrical security device

Title (en)

Electrical security device

Title (de)

Elektrische Sicherungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité électrique

Publication

EP 1093195 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120506 A

Priority

EP 99120506 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a housing for latching onto a rail with a downward protruding dividing bridge that separates cables fed along the rail and isolates them from each other electrically. Penetration contacts on either side of the bridge penetrate the cable insulation after the housing is latched in place to make contact with individual conductors and are connected via fuses bridging interfaces to the electrical lines. The device has a housing (110) that is open at the bottom and that can be latched onto a mounting rail (20). The housing has a downward protruding dividing bridge (116) that separates cables fed along the rail and isolates them from each other electrically. Penetration contacts (118) on either side of the dividing bridge penetrate the cable insulation (30) after the housing is latched in place to make contact with the individual conductors. The penetration contacts on either side of the bridge are connected via fuses (124) bridging interfaces to the electrical lines at the dividing bridge.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine elektrische Sicherungsvorrichtung vorgeschlagen für Geräte, die in unterschiedlicher Zahl und in beliebigem bzw. für jeweils zweckmäßig erachtetem Abstand mit Hilfe eines Befestigungselements auf eine Montage-Schiene (20) aufrastbar sind und die nach dem Aufrasten auf die Montage-Schiene (20) mit ihren jeweiligen, entlang dieser Montage-Schiene geführten, elektrischen Versorgungsleitungen und/oder Signalleitungen elektrisch verbunden sind. Diese Sicherungsvorrichtung weist ein nach unten offenes, mittels einer Schnapphalterung (212) auf die Montage-Schiene (20) aufzurastendes Gehäuse (210) auf, aus dem eine Klinge (215) nach unten herausragt, durch die nach dem Aufrasten des Gehäuses (210) auf die Montage-Schiene (20) die entlang dieser Montage-Schiene (20) geführten, elektrischen Leitungen vollkommen durchtrennt und deren Schnittstellen gegeneinander isoliert sind und in dem beidseitig der Klinge (215) nach unten um ein im Vergleich zur Klinge (215) geringeres Maß herausragende Durchdringungskontakte (218) angeordnet sind, die nach dem Aufrasten des Gehäuses (4) auf die Montage-Schiene (20) die Isolierung (30) der elektrischen Leitungen einseitig durchdringen und an den Leitungen einen elektrischen Kontakt herstellen, wobei die Durchdringungskontakte (218) durch Sicherungen (224) miteinander verbunden sind, die die Schnittstellen der elektrischen Leitungen an der Klinge (215) überbrücken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/68; H01H 85/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/20 (2006.01); H01R 13/68 (2011.01); H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01R 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/68 (2013.01); H01H 85/205 (2013.01); H01H 1/585 (2013.01); H01H 85/201 (2013.01); H01R 25/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093195 A1 20010418; EP 1093195 B1 20030723; DE 59906372 D1 20030828

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131015

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131015

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906372

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131015

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906372 P 20030828

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020725

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDRESS + HAUSER GMBH + CO.KG.

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI