Global Patent Index - EP 1093210 A2

EP 1093210 A2 2001-04-18 - Electrical driving apparatus

Title (en)

Electrical driving apparatus

Title (de)

Elektrische Antriebseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif électrique d'entrainement

Publication

EP 1093210 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122557 A

Priority

JP 29421199 A

Abstract (en)

To continuously detect a position of a rotor of a motor having the rotor formed with a plurality of magnetic poles by permanent magnets without using an expensive encoder, the rotor position is continuously detected by arranging a rotor formed with, for example, 8 poles by permanent magnets, a stator having, for example, 9 slots of magnetic legs opposed to the rotor, an analog type Hall element arranged at a position opposed to the magnetic poles of the rotor, an analog type Hall sensor for outputting an analog magnetism detecting signal the phase of which is shifted by 90 DEG from that of the analog type Hall sensor or a digital type Hall sensor for out-putting a digital magnetism detecting signal comprising a binary signal and comparing the magnetism detecting signals having different phases by 90 DEG . <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02K 29/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60L 11/18 (2006.01); H02K 29/08 (2006.01); H02P 6/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60L 11/1807 (2013.01); H02K 29/08 (2013.01); H02P 6/16 (2013.01); Y02T 10/641 (2013.01); Y02T 10/642 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093210 A2 20010418; EP 1093210 A3 20011219; CN 1293484 A 20010502; JP 2001119914 A 20010427

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020618

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 02K 29/08 A, 7H 02P 6/00 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI