Global Patent Index - EP 1093335 A1

EP 1093335 A1 2001-04-25 - METHOD FOR TREATING COTYLEDONOUS PLANTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TREATING COTYLEDONOUS PLANTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG KEIMBLÄTTRIGER PFLANZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE PLANTES COTYLEDONEES

Publication

EP 1093335 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920954 A

Priority

US 9802725 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940790A1] Application of an aqueous solution containing a matrix polymer and oligomers of chitosan to the foliage of growing plants increases the yield of vegetables, tubers, cereal grains, fruits, and blossoms. Plants so treated are healthier, sturdier, more resistant to drought, and many varieties enjoy an extended period of production. The plants may be effectively and conveniently treated by spraying the foliage with a solution containing 0.005 % to 5.0 % by weight matrix polymer and chitosan oligomers in such amount that the weight ratio of chitosan oligomers to matrix polymer is 0.01 to 10.0.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940790A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940790 A1 19990819; EP 1093335 A1 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-06-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKION LIFE SCIENCES LLC

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020412

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARKION LIFE SCIENCES

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE