Global Patent Index - EP 1093382 A2

EP 1093382 A2 2001-04-25 - USE OF DC-chol FOR PROVIDING AN ADJUVANT TO A SUBUNIT VACCINE

Title (en)

USE OF DC-chol FOR PROVIDING AN ADJUVANT TO A SUBUNIT VACCINE

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON DC-chol ZUR ADJUVIERUNG EINES UNTEREINHEITSIMPFSTOFFS

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE DC-chol POUR ADJUVER UN VACCIN SOUS-UNITAIRE

Publication

EP 1093382 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99929389 A

Priority

  • FR 9901604 W
  • FR 9808700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001345A2] The invention concerns an amphipathic compound for preparing a vaccine composition comprising at least a subunit antigen to be administered to target populations comprising non-responders to said antigen. DC-chol is a particular amphiphatic compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/39; A61K 39/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/29 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/39 (2013.01); A61K 39/12 (2013.01); A61K 39/292 (2013.01); A61K 2039/555 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55505 (2013.01); C12N 2730/10134 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001345A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001345 A2 20000113; WO 0001345 A3 20000224; AU 4621799 A 20000124; CA 2337048 A1 20000113; EP 1093382 A2 20010425; FR 2781160 A1 20000121; FR 2781160 B1 20000818; US 6472159 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080103

2007-10-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2007-07-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF DC-CHOL FOR PROVIDING AN ADJUVANT TO A SUBUNIT VACCINE

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANOFI PASTEUR

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI