Global Patent Index - EP 1093402 A2

EP 1093402 A2 2001-04-25 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPLETE STACK

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A COMPLETE STACK

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES GESAMTSTAPELS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE PILE FINALE

Publication

EP 1093402 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99944237 A

Priority

  • DE 9901957 W
  • DE 19829484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829484C1] The sorting system is for packages of letters (5). The packages may be placed in e.g. three stacks (31-33). There are sets of conveyor belts (14-16) associated with each stack of packages. The three lines of conveyors are arranged in overlapping lines. The conveyors in each line form a straight line and take the lowermost package off each stack. Each stack rests against a wall (2) with a gap (4) at the bottom to allow the lowermost package to slide out. There is a sorting code reader (13) above each set of conveyor belts. The packages are discharged onto a large horizontal conveyor (11) with low dividing barriers (12). As this conveyor belt moves along, several packages from the various stacks may be piled one on top of the other. The packages fall off the end of the big conveyor to make s single stack in a bin (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/08 (2006.01); B07C 3/02 (2006.01); B65H 29/18 (2006.01); B65H 39/043 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 39/043 (2013.01); B07C 3/02 (2013.01); B65H 29/18 (2013.01); B65H 39/055 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4311 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4353 (2013.01); B65H 2404/2691 (2013.01); B65H 2511/40 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/40 + B65H 2220/01

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001496A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829484 C1 19991111; EP 1093402 A2 20010425; EP 1093402 B1 20020814; JP 2002519196 A 20020702; WO 0001496 A2 20000113; WO 0001496 A3 20000224

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-02-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902361

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-08-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-08-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001201

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE