Global patent index - EP 1093434 A1

EP 1093434 A1 2001-04-25 - CONTACT ASSEMBLY AND ACCUMULATION CONVEYOR WITH THE CONTACT ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

CONTACT ASSEMBLY AND ACCUMULATION CONVEYOR WITH THE CONTACT ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

KONTAKTVORRICHTUNG UND STAUFÖRDERER MIT DER KONTAKTVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE CONTACTS ET CONVOYEUR D'ACCUMULATION MUNI DUDIT ENSEMBLE DE CONTACTS

Publication

EP 1093434 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99939981 A

Priority

  • EP 9904619 W
  • US 11011398 A
  • US 20771298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001598A1] A contact assembly (50) for an accumulation conveyor (10) includes a support member (60) having a cavity (72) dimensioned to receive a force producing device (74). A contact member (50) is positioned between the force producing device (74) and the conveying rollers (25) and reciprocates with respect to the conveying rollers (25). The contact member (50) includes a platform (80) which supports a pair of cantilevered contact rollers (84, 84', 86, 86') journaled at opposing ends of the platform (80). When the platform (80) is vertically reciprocated by the force-producing device (74), the contact rollers (84, 84', 86, 86') in driving engagement with a drive belt (30) are forced upward, placing the drive belt (30) into driving contact with the conveying rollers (25). The contact member (50) is rotatably connected to the support member (60) while the contact roller (84, 84', 86, 86') positioned first in the direction of travel of the drive belt is formed with a pair of flanges (85). Contact between the drive belt (30) and the flanges (85) rotates the contact member (50) to thereby maintain alignment of the contact rollers (84, 84', 86, 86') and the drive belt (30).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 13/071; B65G 47/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 13/071 (2006.01); B65G 47/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65G 47/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001598A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001598 A1 20000113; AU 5409399 A 20000124; AU 758360 B2 20030320; BR 9912512 A 20010502; CA 2336620 A1 20000113; CA 2336620 C 20080401; EP 1093434 A1 20010425; JP 2002519269 A 20020702

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031122

2003-03-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ACCUMULATION CONVEYOR WITH A CONTACT ASSEMBLY

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE