Global patent index - EP 1093479 A1

EP 1093479 A1 2001-04-25 - POLYMERIC COMPOSITIONS FOR SOIL RELEASE ON FABRICS

Title (en)

POLYMERIC COMPOSITIONS FOR SOIL RELEASE ON FABRICS

Title (de)

POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR SCHMUTZLÖSUNG IN GEWEBE

Title (fr)

Compositions de polymères antisalissures pour tissus

Publication

EP 1093479 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99928687 A

Priority

  • US 9913535 W
  • US 8987198 P
  • US 31226499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9965959A1] A copolymer composition and its use as a soil release agent for fabrics comprising monomers copolymerized in the following percentages by weight: (a) from about 30 % to about 49 % of at least one monomer of formula (I): Rf-Q-A-C(O)-C(R)=CH2, wherein Rf is a straight or branched-chain perfluoroalkyl group of from 2 to about 20 carbon atoms, R is H or CH3, A is O, S or N(R'), wherein R' is H or an alkyl from 1 to about 4 carbon atoms, Q is alkylene of 1 to about 15 carbon atoms, hydroxyalkylene of 3 to about 15 carbon atoms, -(CnH2n)(OCqH2q)m-, -SO2-NR'(CnH2n)-, or -CONR'(CnH2n)-, wherein R' is H or an alkyl of from 1 to about 4 carbon atoms, n is 1 to about 15, q is 2 to about 4, and m is 1 to about 15; (b) from about 10 % to about 70 % of at least one monomer or a mixture of monomers selected from the formulae (IIA): (R1)2N-(CH2)r-Z-C(O)-C(R2)=CH2, (IIB): (O)(R3)(R4)N-(CH2)r-Z-C(O)-C(R2)=CH2, (IIC): X<->(R5)(R4)(R3)N<+>-(CH2)r-Z-C(O)-C(R2)=CH2, wherein Z is -O- or -NR5-; R1 is an alkyl group of from 1 to about 3 carbon atoms; R2 is H or an alkyl radical of 1 to about 4 carbon atoms; R3 and R4 are each an alkyl of 1 to 4 carbon atoms, hydroxyethyl, benzyl, or R3 and R4 together with the nitrogen atom form a morpholine, pyrrolidine, or piperadine ring; R5 is H or an alkyl of 1 to 4 carbon atoms, or R3, R4 and R5 together with the nitrogen atom form a pyridine ring; r is 2 to 4; and wherein for formula (IIA) the nitrogen is from about 40 % to 100 % salinized; and (c) eventually other monomers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 220/24; C08F 220/34; C08L 33/14; C08L 33/16; D06M 15/263; D06M 15/267; D06M 15/273; D06M 15/277

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/24 (2006.01); C08F 220/34 (2006.01); C08L 33/16 (2006.01); D06M 15/263 (2006.01); D06M 15/267 (2006.01); D06M 15/273 (2006.01); D06M 15/277 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 15/277 (2013.01); C08F 220/24 (2013.01); C08F 220/34 (2013.01); C08L 33/16 (2013.01); D06M 15/263 (2013.01); D06M 15/267 (2013.01); D06M 15/273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9965959A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9965959 A1 19991223; AU 4569099 A 20000105; BR 9911848 A 20010403; CA 2330051 A1 19991223; CN 1130400 C 20031210; CN 1309673 A 20010822; DE 69932931 D1 20061005; DE 69932931 T2 20070510; EP 1093479 A1 20010425; EP 1093479 B1 20060823; ID 27010 A 20010222; TW 466259 B 20011201; US 2002052457 A1 20020502; US 6326447 B1 20011204; US 6478981 B2 20021112

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070616

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070616

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69932931

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-10-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-08-23 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2006-08-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2006-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2006-08-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2006-08-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030724

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL