Global Patent Index - EP 1093510 A1

EP 1093510 A1 2001-04-25 - COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR LUBRICATED PLASTIC WORKING OF METALS

Title (en)

COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR LUBRICATED PLASTIC WORKING OF METALS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG VON METALLEN MIT SCHMIERKUNSTSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE POUR L'ENROBAGE DE METAUX AVEC UN PLASTIQUE LUBRIFIE

Publication

EP 1093510 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927194 A

Priority

  • JP 17660298 A
  • US 9912364 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964544A1] A lubricant composition for the plastic working of metals that does not require a phosphate undercoating, is waterborne, requires only a simple application process of immersion or spraying followed by drying, and provides an excellent lubricating performance comprises synthetic resin, water-soluble inorganic salt, and water. The weight ratio of the content of salt to that of synthetic resin is from 0.25:1 to 9:1. This composition can also contain liquid and/or solid lubricating agent(s) and extreme pressure additive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 125/00; C10M 129/26; C10M 169/00; C10M 173/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 111/04 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2013.01); C10M 111/04 (2013.01); C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 2201/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/041 (2013.01); C10M 2201/042 (2013.01); C10M 2201/06 (2013.01); C10M 2201/065 (2013.01); C10M 2201/066 (2013.01); C10M 2201/08 (2013.01); C10M 2201/081 (2013.01); C10M 2201/082 (2013.01); C10M 2201/084 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/18 (2013.01); C10M 2205/022 (2013.01); C10M 2205/024 (2013.01); C10M 2205/14 (2013.01); C10M 2205/16 (2013.01); C10M 2205/17 (2013.01); C10M 2205/18 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2209/04 (2013.01); C10M 2209/06 (2013.01); C10M 2209/062 (2013.01); C10M 2209/08 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2209/101 (2013.01); C10M 2209/11 (2013.01); C10M 2209/111 (2013.01); C10M 2209/112 (2013.01); C10M 2211/044 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10M 2211/08 (2013.01); C10M 2217/024 (2013.01); C10M 2217/028 (2013.01); C10M 2217/042 (2013.01); C10M 2217/043 (2013.01); C10M 2217/044 (2013.01); C10M 2217/045 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/022 (2013.01); C10M 2219/024 (2013.01); C10M 2219/062 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/082 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/03 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2240/402 (2013.01); C10N 2240/403 (2013.01); C10N 2240/404 (2013.01); C10N 2240/405 (2013.01); C10N 2240/406 (2013.01); C10N 2240/407 (2013.01); C10N 2240/408 (2013.01); C10N 2240/409 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01); C10N 2250/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964544 A1 19991216; AT 321831 T 20060415; AU 4416299 A 19991230; AU 763155 B2 20030717; CA 2334716 A1 19991216; CA 2334716 C 20090818; CN 1148437 C 20040505; CN 1243150 A 20000202; DE 69930628 D1 20060518; DE 69930628 T2 20070201; EP 1093510 A1 20010425; EP 1093510 A4 20020605; EP 1093510 B1 20060329; ES 2257053 T3 20060716; IN 192718 B 20040515; KR 20000006017 A 20000125; TW 444056 B 20010701

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2257053 T3

2006-06-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69930628 P 20060518

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-03-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2006-02-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL CORPORATION

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-06-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10M 173/02 A, 7C 10M 173/02 J, 7C 10M 125:10 J, 7C 10M 125:22 J, 7C 10M 125:26 J, 7C 10M 129:40 J, 7C 10M 143:02 J, 7C 10M 145:04 J, 7C 10M 145:12 J, 7C 10M 145:14 J, 7C 10M 145:18 J, 7C 10M 145:20 J, 7C 10M 147:02 J, 7C 10M 149:10 J, 7C 10M 149:18 J, 7C 10M 159:06 J, 7C 10N 40:24 Z, 7C 10N 50:02 Z

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT SE