Global Patent Index - EP 1093520 A1

EP 1093520 A1 2001-04-25 - HMP-P KINASE AND TMP-PPASE FROM ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA AND THEIR USE IN HERBICIDE SCREENING

Title (en)

HMP-P KINASE AND TMP-PPASE FROM ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA AND THEIR USE IN HERBICIDE SCREENING

Title (de)

HMP-P KINASE UND TMP-PPASE AUS ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IM HERBIZID-SCREENING

Title (fr)

HMP. KINASE ET TMP-PPASE PROVENANT D'ARABIDOPSIS THALIANA ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE CRIBLAGE D'HERBICIDES

Publication

EP 1093520 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931202 A

Priority

  • EP 9904465 W
  • US 10925498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0000623A1] The present invention discloses methods to screen chemicals for herbicidal activity using recombinantly produced enzymes having HMP-P kinase activity or TMP-PPase activity, and the use of thereby to identify herbicidal chemicals to suppress the growth of undesired vegetation. Furthermore, the present invention provides methods for the development of herbicide tolerance in plants, plant tissues, plant seeds, and plant cells using genes encoding enzymes having HMP-P kinase activity or TMP-PPase activity, and methods of using such transgenic plants to selectively suppress weed growth in crop fields.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/54; A01H 5/00; C12N 9/10; C12N 9/12; C12N 15/10; C12N 15/82; C12Q 1/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/54 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1085 (2013.01); C12N 9/1205 (2013.01); C12N 15/8243 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000623A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0000623 A1 20000106; AU 4778999 A 20000117; CA 2331881 A1 20000106; CN 1317051 A 20011010; EP 1093520 A1 20010425; JP 2002519035 A 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1037208

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-09-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031107

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEVIN, JOSHUA, ZVI

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: POTTER, SHARON, LEE

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BAUER, MICHAEL, WILLIAM

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE