Global Patent Index - EP 1093534 A1

EP 1093534 A1 2001-04-25 - METHOD FOR REMOVING LAYERS OF HARD MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REMOVING LAYERS OF HARD MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ENTSCHICHTEN VON HARTSTOFFSCHICHTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR ENLEVER DES COUCHES DE SUBSTANCE DURE

Publication

EP 1093534 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920529 A

Priority

  • CH 9900234 W
  • CH 126998 A
  • CH 140498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964646A1] The invention relates to a method for removing layers of hard material other than titanium nitride from hard metal substrates. According to said method, an intermediate layer of titanium nitride is applied between the hard metal substrate and the layer of hard material and the hard material is removed by selectively dissolving said intermediate layer through pores of the layer of hard material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23G 1/20; C23G 1/19; C23G 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23G 5/00 (2006.01); C23G 1/19 (2006.01); C23G 1/20 (2006.01); C23G 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23G 1/19 (2013.01); C23G 1/20 (2013.01); C23G 1/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964646A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964646 A1 19991216; DE 59914591 D1 20080207; EP 1093534 A1 20010425; EP 1093534 B1 20071226; JP 2002517615 A 20020618; JP 4824163 B2 20111130; US 2001013356 A1 20010816; US 6706122 B2 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080204

2008-02-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914591 P 20080207

2008-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2006-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OERLIKON TRADING AG, TRUEBBACH

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020318

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE