Global Patent Index - EP 1093535 A1

EP 1093535 A1 2001-04-25 - FILTERING DEVICE AND SPINNING HEAD

Title (en)

FILTERING DEVICE AND SPINNING HEAD

Title (de)

FILTERVORRICHTUNG UND SPINNKOPF

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FILTRATION ET TETE DE FILAGE

Publication

EP 1093535 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927841 A

Priority

  • DE 19825532 A
  • EP 9903814 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19825532A1] The invention relates to a filtering device for a spinning head (10) for producing plastic threads and to the spinning head itself (10). The spinning head has a housing (12) in which the plastic melt flows through a filter element (18) under pressure before exiting the spinnerets. Said filter element is provided with a filtering material (20) that is subjected to an axial contact pressure through a distributor device (22), according to the degree of pressure of the melt. This contact pressure acts upon the sealing edges (26, 28) of the filter element (18), the sealing gaps (24) being closed. The special geometrical configuration of the filter element (18) and/or its elasticity guarantee advantageous filtering in terms of energy. The filtering system is resistant to pressure and provides good, permanent sealing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 4/00; D01D 4/06; D01D 4/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 4/08 (2006.01); D01D 1/10 (2006.01); D01D 4/00 (2006.01); D01D 4/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 1/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964648A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19825532 A1 19991209; CN 1105792 C 20030416; CN 1304462 A 20010718; EP 1093535 A1 20010425; EP 1093535 B1 20020821; ES 2182537 T3 20030301; JP 2002517629 A 20020618; JP 4343436 B2 20091014; KR 100516318 B1 20050923; US 6604928 B1 20030812; WO 9964648 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140610

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080603

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2182537

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902419

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-26

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020128

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000825

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI