Global Patent Index - EP 1093536 A1

EP 1093536 A1 2001-04-25 - METHODS OF MANUFACTURE OF NONWOVEN FABRIC

Title (en)

METHODS OF MANUFACTURE OF NONWOVEN FABRIC

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VLIESSTOFFES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE SERVANT A FABRIQUER UN NON-TISSE

Publication

EP 1093536 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99925203 A

Priority

  • GB 9901775 W
  • GB 9812089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2337957A] A nonwoven cellulose fabric is manufactured by extruding a solution of cellulose through at least one spinning jet to form fibres, subjecting the fibres to a high velocity gas flow, and passing the fibres through a vapour mist which at least partially coagulates the fibres prior to collection as a fabric web. The vapour mist may be a low alkyl alcohol or water, and is preferably formed by an atomiser nozzle located below the spinning jet(s). The gas flow is preferably compressed air which is directed onto the fibres at an angle of 30‹ to the axis of the extrudate fibres. The cellulose solution preferably contains 4-22%, and most preferably 10-15%, by weight cellulose, using an amine oxide as solvent. The fibre web may be collected on a dry surface with the subsequent treatment of the web with a coagulant, or it may alternatively be collected onto a surface wetted with coagulant. The fibre web is preferably collected on a compliant surface, which may be provided by a 2mm thick foam layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/00; D01D 5/098; D04H 1/56; D04H 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/06 (2006.01); D01F 2/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/425 (2012.01); D04H 1/4258 (2012.01); D04H 1/56 (2006.01); D04H 3/013 (2012.01); D04H 3/015 (2012.01); D04H 3/03 (2012.01); D04H 3/14 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4258 (2013.01); D01F 2/00 (2013.01); D04H 1/425 (2013.01); D04H 1/56 (2013.01); D04H 3/013 (2013.01); D04H 3/015 (2013.01); D04H 3/03 (2013.01); D04H 3/14 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964649A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2337957 A 19991208; GB 9812089 D0 19980805; AT 251239 T 20031015; AU 4158299 A 19991230; BR 9910862 A 20010306; CA 2333882 A1 19991216; CN 1161502 C 20040811; CN 1304464 A 20010718; DE 69911776 D1 20031106; DE 69911776 T2 20040819; EP 1093536 A1 20010425; EP 1093536 B1 20031001; ES 2209444 T3 20040616; ID 27038 A 20010222; JP 2002517630 A 20020618; JP 4373008 B2 20091125; TR 200003602 T2 20010420; TW 419543 B 20010121; WO 9964649 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LENZING AG, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TENCEL LTD., SPONDON, DERBY, GB

- Document: DE 69911776

- Effective date: 20110808

2011-09-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69911776

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20110808

2011-09-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69911776

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20110808

2011-05-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2011-05-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-04-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20110405

2011-02-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110127 AND 20110202

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TENCEL LTD

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050604

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209444 T3

2004-06-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040616

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040511

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69911776 P 20031106

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: NONWOVEN FABRIC AND METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE

2003-03-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: NONWOVEN FABRIC AND METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT SE