Global patent index - EP 1093560 A1

EP 1093560 A1 2001-04-25 - ING

Title (en)

ING

Title (de)

RINGKAMMEROFEN MIT TUBULARER ZENTRALGASSTRÖMUNG

Title (fr)

FOUR A FEU TOURNANT A FLUX CENTRAL TUBULAIRE

Publication

EP 1093560 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99925058 A

Priority

  • FR 9901339 W
  • FR 9807536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779811A1] The invention concerns a furnace for baking carbon bricks comprising, in the longitudinal direction X, a series of chambers, each of the chambers comprising, in the transverse direction Y, alternating hollow partitions (3) ensuring a gas flow for heating fuel gas or a cooling air gas flow, and cells containing the carbon bricks to be baked, each of said hollow partitions (3) of a chamber communicating with a partition upstream and/or downstream, so as to form a duct enabling the gas flow to circulate. Each of said partitions of a chamber comprises, in the plane X-Z, two vertical side walls (38), and, in the transverse direction Y, elements deflecting said gas flow and maintaining a constant spacing of said side walls (38). The invention is characterised in that each partition (3) comprises means for preserving, over at least one third of length L of said partition, a gas flow with flow rate D homogeneously distributed over said partition entire cross-section S, with homogeneity level of said flow rate distribution defined by: 2y.D-0.5y.D / y.S, where 2y.D-0.5 y.D represents the extent of the range of flow rate D corresponding to a fraction y of said cross-section S, and where y is not more than 0.25.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27B 13/02 (2006.01); F27B 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 13/06 (2013.01); F27B 13/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9964804A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779811 A1 19991217; FR 2779811 B1 20000728; AR 018655 A1 20011128; AU 4147899 A 19991230; AU 745152 B2 20020314; AU 745152 C 20020926; BR 9911134 A 20011023; CA 2334994 A1 19991216; CA 2334994 C 20090203; CN 100445680 C 20081224; CN 1305579 A 20010725; DE 69906296 D1 20030430; DE 69906296 T2 20031204; EG 21714 A 20020227; EP 1093560 A1 20010425; EP 1093560 B1 20030326; ES 2191433 T3 20030901; GC 0000056 A 20040630; NO 20006234 A 20001207; NO 20006234 D0 20001207; NO 322639 B1 20061113; NZ 508349 A 20031031; TW 432194 B 20010501; US 6027339 A 20000222; WO 9964804 A1 19991216; ZA 200007066 B 20020228

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69906296

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69906296

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130702

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110609

2012-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20121116

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100628

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191433

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69906296

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL

2002-06-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: RING TYPE FURNACE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR NL