Global Patent Index - EP 1093598 A1

EP 1093598 A1 2001-04-25 - SPECTRUM-CONTROLLABLE REFLECTIVE POLARIZERS HAVING ELECTRICALLY-SWITCHABLE MODES OF OPERATION

Title (en)

SPECTRUM-CONTROLLABLE REFLECTIVE POLARIZERS HAVING ELECTRICALLY-SWITCHABLE MODES OF OPERATION

Title (de)

REFLEKTIERENDE POLARISATOREN MIT REGELBAREM SPEKTRUM UND ELEKTRISCH SCHALTBAREN BETRIEBSMODEN

Title (fr)

POLARISEURS REFLECHISSANTS A SPECTRE REGLABLE ET A MODES DE FONCTIONNEMENT ELECTRIQUEMENT COMMUTABLES

Publication

EP 1093598 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927322 A

Priority

  • US 9912759 W
  • US 9300698 A
  • US 9301798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9963400A1] A light controlling film (10) is disclosed, comprising a polymerized polymer network varying spatially in a direction normal to the film surface, where the polymerized polymer network is a cross-linked high molecular weight polymeric material mixed with a low molecular weight nematic material exhibiting cholesteric liquid crystal (CLC) order, wherein an electric field impressed in the film controls the reflection bandwidth of circularly polarized light.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/1335; G02F 1/1347; G02F 1/137

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/30 (2006.01); E06B 9/24 (2006.01); G02F 1/13 (2006.01); G02F 1/1334 (2006.01); G02F 1/1335 (2006.01); G02F 1/1347 (2006.01); G02F 1/137 (2006.01); G02F 1/1333 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 15/00 (2013.01); E06B 9/24 (2013.01); G02F 1/1334 (2013.01); G02F 1/13718 (2013.01); G02F 1/133365 (2013.01); G02F 2001/13345 (2013.01); G02F 2001/133543 (2013.01); G02F 2203/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9963400 A1 19991209; AU 4425699 A 19991220; CA 2333871 A1 19991209; CN 1179233 C 20041208; CN 1312918 A 20010912; EP 1093598 A1 20010425; EP 1093598 A4 20020724; JP 2002517784 A 20020618; KR 20010071415 A 20010728

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-01-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1037737

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040920

2002-07-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010104

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE