Global patent index - EP 1093736 A2

EP 1093736 A2 2001-04-25 - Portable easel

Title (en)

Portable easel

Title (de)

Transportfähige Staffelei

Title (fr)

Chevalet transportable

Publication

EP 1093736 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01100016 A

Priority

  • EP 94303760 A
  • US 7473393 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a portable easel (10) comprising a base pedestal portion (11) having leg means (18) pivotally mounted on and foldable towards and away from said base pedestal portion (11) for securing said base pedestal portion (11) upright on a surface. The easel (10) further comprises a display portion (12) telescopingly engaged with said base pedestal portion (11) and having means for removably securing thereon display materials. Said portions (11,12) are movable relative to one another into extended and collapsed positions and have cooperating interlocking means for securing in one of a plurality of selected positions. One of said portions (11,12) comprises a hollow body having spaced apart walls incorporating reinforcing recesses and wall surfaces arranged to provide rigidity across said body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 97/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 97/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 97/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0628267 A2 19941214; EP 0628267 A3 19970521; EP 0628267 B1 20020313; AT 214245 T 20020315; DE 60124795 D1 20070111; DE 69430084 D1 20020418; EP 1093736 A2 20010425; EP 1093736 A3 20010816; EP 1093736 B1 20060322

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070525

2007-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60124795

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-01-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-07-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-06-23 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060623

2006-03-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0628267

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060322

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-07-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47B 97/08 A, 7B 42F 15/06 B

2001-04-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 628267

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE