Global Patent Index - EP 1093750 A2

EP 1093750 A2 2001-04-25 - Curtain for the separation of a wet and a dry area, particularly a curtain for a shower or a bath

Title (en)

Curtain for the separation of a wet and a dry area, particularly a curtain for a shower or a bath

Title (de)

Trennvorhang zum Abtrennen eines Nassbereiches von einem Trockenbereich, insbesondere Dusch- oder Brausebadvorhang

Title (fr)

Rideau de séparation d'une zone humide d'une zone sèche, en particulier rideau de douche ou de baignoire

Publication

EP 1093750 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122488 A

Priority

DE 29918260 U

Abstract (en)

The water repellent, air-permeable separating curtain, in particular, for shower units takes the form of a nonwoven sheet of fiber materials.

Abstract (de)

Ein wasserabweisender Trennvorhang (1) aus Fasermaterial oder dergleichen zum Abtrennen eines Naßbereiches (A) von einem Trockenbereich (B), insbesondere Dusch- oder Brausebadvorhang, soll so ausgebildet werden, dass die Herstellung eines derartigen Trennvorhangs (1) weiter vereinfacht und eine preisgünstigere Fertigung ermöglicht wird. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, dass der Trennvorhang (1) aus einem Vlies (2) besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093750 A2 20010425; EP 1093750 A3 20030129; DE 29918260 U1 20010405

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-11-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI