Global Patent Index - EP 1093753 A2

EP 1093753 A2 2001-04-25 - Domestic appliance, in particular dishwasher

Title (en)

Domestic appliance, in particular dishwasher

Title (de)

Hausgerät, inbesondere Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil électroménager en particuler lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1093753 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117893 A

Priority

DE 19950963 A

Abstract (en)

The washing machine has an n-digit seven-segment display (2) for natural numbers. The display is supplied with signals from a control circuit to display numbers having n+1 digits. The numbers can be displayed by a sequential display at a single seven-segment display. A break of some seconds can be provided between each complete sequence. The seven-segment element (4,6) can be controlled to display only the vertical elements.

Abstract (de)

Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, ein Hausgerät, bei dem auch die Restlaufzeit und/oder die Programmdauer vergleichsweise langer Programme mit geringem Aufwand anzeigbar sind. Diese Aufgabe wird bei einem Hausgerät, insbesondere einer Geschirrspülmaschine, erfindungsgemäß dadurch gelöst, daß die n-stellige Siebensegmentanzeige (2, 8) von einer Steuerschaltung mit Signalen beaufschlagt wird, die das Anzeigen einer mindestens (n+1)-stelligen natürlichen Zahl erlaubt. Auf diese Weise genügt beispielsweise bei einer Geschirrspülmaschine die Verwendung einer zweistelligen Siebensegment-Anzeige um auch Restlaufzeiten und/oder Programmdauern von mehr als 99 Minuten anzeigen zu können.Eine mögliche Alternative zur Umsetzung sieht es in Ausgestaltung der Erfindung vor, daß die mindestens (n+1)-stellige natürliche Zahl mittels einer sequentiellen Darstellung an einer einstelligen Siebensegmentanzeige darstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/46; D06F 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/005 (2013.01); A47L 15/4293 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093753 A2 20010425; EP 1093753 A3 20021106; DE 19950963 A1 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070402

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI