Global Patent Index - EP 1093753 A3

EP 1093753 A3 2002-11-06 - Domestic appliance, in particular dishwasher

Title (en)

Domestic appliance, in particular dishwasher

Title (de)

Hausgerät, inbesondere Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil électroménager en particuler lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1093753 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00117893 A

Priority

DE 19950963 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1093753A2] The washing machine has an n-digit seven-segment display (2) for natural numbers. The display is supplied with signals from a control circuit to display numbers having n+1 digits. The numbers can be displayed by a sequential display at a single seven-segment display. A break of some seconds can be provided between each complete sequence. The seven-segment element (4,6) can be controlled to display only the vertical elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/46; D06F 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/005 (2013.01); A47L 15/4293 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093753 A2 20010425; EP 1093753 A3 20021106; DE 19950963 A1 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070402

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI