Global Patent Index - EP 1093834 A2

EP 1093834 A2 2001-04-25 - System of modular components for toy construction

Title (en)

System of modular components for toy construction

Title (de)

System mit modularen Komponenten für Bauspielzeug

Title (fr)

Système d'éléments modulaires pour jouet de construction

Publication

EP 1093834 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99203412 A

Priority

IT MA982241 A

Abstract (en)

A system of modular components is disclosed, allowing to build toy constructions. The system comprises two kinds of modules referred to as active modules and passive modules. The active modules are provided with magnets while the passive modules are of non-magnetized metallic or semimetallic material so as to be attracted by the magnets. In this way toy constructions of any kind can be built by simple juxtaposition of active modules only or active modules alternated with passive modules. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 33/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/046 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093834 A2 20010425; EP 1093834 A3 20030305

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-11-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI