Global Patent Index - EP 1093862 A1

EP 1093862 A1 2001-04-25 - Parcel sorting arrangement

Title (en)

Parcel sorting arrangement

Title (de)

Verteilanordnung für Pakete

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tri de colis

Publication

EP 1093862 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810958 A

Priority

EP 99810958 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a conveyor, at least one generating group that passes the packets to the conveyor and at least one target group that acquires the packets from the conveyor for further transport. The conveyor forms a closed path and runs in at least two levels one above the other, with at least one generating group and at least two target groups arranged in series along the closed path. The arrangement has a conveyor (2), at least one generating group (4,5) that passes the packets to the conveyor and at least one target group (7,8) that acquires the packets from the conveyor for further transport. The conveyor forms a closed path and runs in at least two levels one above the other, with at least one generating group and at least two target groups arranged in series along the closed path. There can be at least one other generating group with each generating group supplying the target groups.

Abstract (de)

Die Verteilanordnung weist eine Fördervorrichtung (2) und wenigstens eine Erzeuggruppe (4,5) auf, die die Pakete (3) der Fördervorrichtung (2) übergibt. Wenigstens eine Zielgruppe (7,8) übernimmt die Pakete (3) von der Fördervorrichtung (2) für den Weitertransport. Die Fördervorrichtung (2) bildet einen geschlossenen Rundlauf (R), der in wenigstens zwei übereinanderliegenden Ebenen (A,B) verläuft. Wenigstens eine Erzeugergruppe (4,5) und wenigstens zwei Zielgruppen (7,8) sind entlang das geschlossenen Rundlaufs (R) in Serie angeordnet. Die Verteilanordnung ermöglicht eine Zwischenpufferung und bei höherer Leistung einen kleineren Rechneraufwand. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093862 A1 20010425; US 6505730 B1 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030130

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI