Global patent index - EP 1093863 A2

EP 1093863 A2 2001-04-25 - Cleaning station for spraying and/or rinsing vehicle bodies and process for cleaning vehicle bodies

Title (en)

Cleaning station for spraying and/or rinsing vehicle bodies and process for cleaning vehicle bodies

Title (de)

Reinigungsstation zum Besprühen und/oder Spülen von Fahrzeugkarosserien und Verfahren zum Reinigen von Fahrzeugkarosserien

Title (fr)

Station de nettoyage pour asperger et/ou rincer des carroseries de véhicules et procédé de nettoyage de carrosseries de véhicules

Publication

EP 1093863 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119442 A

Priority

DE 19950197 A

Abstract (en)

The washer station has a turntable (110) with holders for vehicle bodies (308). The turntable is constructed so that a body is turned about an axis from an initial position through an angle of more than 90 degrees , and is stopped in washing positions within the set angular area. The station has a moveable spray or washer plant (150), which is moved into working position when the body is also in cleaning position. The spray/washer plant can be moved into the vehicle body.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Reinigungsstation (100) zum Besprühen und/oder Spülen von Fahrzeugkarosserien (308) mit einem Naßmedium, umfassend eine Drehvorrichtung (110), welche eine Aufnahme für eine Fahrzeugkarosserie umfaßt und mittels welcher die Fahrzeugkarosserie in mindestens eine Reinigungsstellung drehbar ist, und mindestens eine Sprüh- oder Spülvorrichtung (150,148), zu schaffen, welche es ermöglicht, Fahrzeugkarosserien jeden Typs möglichst effizient zu reinigen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Drehvorrichtung so ausgebildet ist, daß die in der Aufnahme aufgenommene Fahrzeugkarosserie um eine Drehachse der Drehvorrichtung aus einer Ausgangsstellung um einen Winkel von mehr als 90° drehbar und in innerhalb des zugänglichen Winkelbereichs beliebig vorgebbaren Reinigungsstellungen anhaltbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/022 (2013.01); B08B 3/024 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093863 A2 20010425; EP 1093863 A3 20020522; DE 19950197 A1 20010510; DE 19950197 B4 20040519

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021123

2003-03-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-02-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-05-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI