Global Patent Index - EP 1093869 A2

EP 1093869 A2 2001-04-25 - Device for bending and/or punching and/or upsetting wire or strip

Title (en)

Device for bending and/or punching and/or upsetting wire or strip

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Biegen und/oder Stanzen und/oder Stauchen von Draht- oder streifenartigen Blechteilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de cintrage et/ou d'estampage et/ou de refoulage de fil ou bande métallique

Publication

EP 1093869 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116924 A

Priority

DE 19950297 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a machine table and electronically controlled tools with hydraulic-mechanical drives. Each drive (1) is a hydraulic cylinder, and for pressure charging, it has an electric motor (3) with transmission (4,5), which acts on the piston (11) associated with the cylinder. The motor is a stepping motor and there is a spindle drive (4) for power transmission from piston to cylinder. All components are part of a module located in a frame.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen wird eine Vorrichtung zum Biegen und/oder Stanzen und/oder Stauchen von Draht- oder streifenartigen Blechteilen, bei der an einem Maschinentisch geführt mehrere über hydraulisch-mechanische Geber 1 angetriebene und elektronisch gesteuerte Werkzeuge angeordnet sind. Dabei ist jedem Geber 1 zur hydraulischen Druckbeaufschlagung ein Elektromotor 3 mit einem zwischengeschalteten Getriebe 4, 5 zugeordnet, der auf den Kolben 11 des jeweiligen hydraulischen-mechanischen Gebers 1 wirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 1/00; B21J 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 1/00 (2006.01); B21F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 99/00 (2013.01); B21F 1/00 (2013.01); B21F 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093869 A2 20010425; EP 1093869 A3 20020724; EP 1093869 B1 20050119; DE 19950297 C1 20010517; ES 2233249 T3 20050616; US 6378353 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080805

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050726

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060807

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060805

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060807

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060805

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-10-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050829

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050726

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233249 T3

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-05-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI