Global Patent Index - EP 1093871 A2

EP 1093871 A2 2001-04-25 - Forging machine

Title (en)

Forging machine

Title (de)

Schmiedemaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à forger

Publication

EP 1093871 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890231 A

Priority

AT 170799 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has two two-part forging dies with a hydraulic pad between the parts, connected to a hydraulic system. The hydraulic system (11) is formed as an additional lifting drive for the forging dies (2). When the mechanical lifting drive is stopped or inactive, the hydraulic pads (9) are charged by the system, to move a lower part (7) of a forging die independently of an upper part (8). The drive train of the mechanical drive has a clutch and a brake. The mechanical drive is an eccentric drive, and there is a common drive motor for both drive systems.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schmiedemaschine (1) weist wenigstens zwei gegeneinander wirkende, längsgeführte und mechanisch antreibbare Schmiedestempel (2) auf, die aus zwei Teilen, einem antriebsseitigen Oberteil (8) und einem werkzeugseitigen Unterteil (7), bestehen und zwischen dem Oberteil (8) und dem mittels einer Druckfeder (6) gegen den Oberteil (8) druckbeaufschlagbaren Unterteil (7) einen an eine Hydraulikanlage (11) angeschlossenen Hydraulikpolster (9) aufnehmen. Um die Schmiedemaschine (1) auch zum Schmieden mit geringen Verformungsgeschwindigkeiten einsetzen zu können, ist die Hydraulikanlage (11) als zusätzlicher Hubantrieb für die Schmiedestempel (2) ausgelegt, über den bei angehaltenem oder hubbewegungsunwirksamem mechanischem Hubantrieb durch Hydraulikmittelbeaufschlagung der Hydraulikpolster (9) jeweils der Unterteil (7) der Schmiedestempel (2) im Sinne einer vom Oberteil (8) unabhängigen Hubbewegung antreibbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21J 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 9/20 (2006.01); B21J 7/14 (2006.01); B21J 9/12 (2006.01); B30B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 9/12 (2013.01); B21J 7/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093871 A2 20010425; EP 1093871 A3 20020626; AT 407617 B 20010525; AT A170799 A 20000915; JP 2001150084 A 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-04-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21J 7/14 A, 7B 30B 1/26 B, 7B 21J 7/46 B

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI