Global patent index - EP 1093886 A2

EP 1093886 A2 2001-04-25 - Device for producing a laminar flame flow profile

Title (en)

Device for producing a laminar flame flow profile

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer laminaren Flammfront

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'obtention d'une flamme laminaire

Publication

EP 1093886 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810883 A

Priority

DE 19950351 A

Abstract (en)

The generator of a laminar flame front has two parallel combustion chamber walls (14,18) between which is an ignition device (52) for igniting the gas mixture between the walls. The ignition device is contained in a cage (51) which has a number of passages through (53) the cage walls. The cage is in the form of a hollow cylinder with lengthwise axis at right angles to the combustion chamber walls.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung einer laminaren Flammfront für brennkraftbetriebene Setzgeräte enthält zwei parallel zueinander liegende Brennkammerwände (14, 18) und eine zwischen den Brennkammerwänden (14, 18) angeordnete Zündvorrichtung (52) zum Zünden eines zwischen den Brennkammerwänden (14, 18) befindlichen brennbaren Gasgemisches. Zwischen den Brennkammerwänden (14, 18) ist ein Käfig (51) zur Aufnahme der Zündvorrichtung (52) vorgesehen, der eine Anzahl von Durchgangsöffnungen (53) aufweist, die durch eine Umfangswand des Käfigs (51) hindurchtreten. Durch diesen Käfig (51) läßt sich eine schnellere laminare Flammfront erzeugen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/08 (2006.01); F01B 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093886 A2 20010425; EP 1093886 A3 20050406; EP 1093886 B1 20080423; DE 19950351 A1 20010503; DE 19950351 C2 20020613; DE 50015119 D1 20080605; JP 2001191258 A 20010717; JP 4550254 B2 20100922; US 6491015 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150926

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150926

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50015119

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090126

2009-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015119

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-11-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI