Global Patent Index - EP 1093887 A2

EP 1093887 A2 2001-04-25 - Metering head, in particular for a combustion-driven fastener setting tool

Title (en)

Metering head, in particular for a combustion-driven fastener setting tool

Title (de)

Dosierkopf, insbesondere für brennkraftbetriebene Setzgeräte

Title (fr)

Tête de dosage, en particulier pour outil de scellement entraîné par combustion

Publication

EP 1093887 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810885 A

Priority

DE 19950350 A

Abstract (en)

The dispenser-head has an inlet (8) for liquid fuel gas, and at least two outlets (16,17) in the form of nozzles, and dispenser valve (5) connected to the inlet and outlets. The lengthwise axis (6) of the dispenser valve is at least approximately at right angles to a lengthwise axis of the outlets. The dispenser valves have differently sized dispenser chambers with inlets.

Abstract (de)

Ein Dosierkopf (1) zur dosierten Ausgabe eines flüssigen Brenngases in unterschiedliche Brennkammern eines Arbeitsgeräts, insbesondere eines Setzgeräts für Befestigungselemente, weist einen Eingang (8) zur Aufnahme des flüssigen Brenngases und wenigstens zwei Ausgänge (16, 17) auf, sowie wenigstens ein mit dem Eingang (8) und den Ausgängen (16, 17) verbundenes Dosierventil (5; 5a, 5b). Dadurch ist eine individuelle Dosierung der jeweiligen Brennkammern mit flüssigem Brenngas möglich, um z.B. Luft-/Brenngasgemische in den jeweiligen Brennkammern in gewünschter Weise einstellen zu können. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/04 (2006.01); B25C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4032202 A1 19920416 - HILTI AG [LI]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093887 A2 20010425; EP 1093887 A3 20041006; EP 1093887 B1 20060816; DE 19950350 A1 20010503; DE 19950350 C2 20020620; DE 50013326 D1 20060928; ES 2270802 T3 20070416; JP 2001191257 A 20010717; JP 4729163 B2 20110720; KR 20010049981 A 20010615; US 6419168 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150810

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070518

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2270802

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060923

2006-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-09-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-08-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-06-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20050406

2004-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI