Global patent index - EP 1093888 A2

EP 1093888 A2 2001-04-25 - Method and device for the driving of a piston of a combustion-driven working tool

Title (en)

Method and device for the driving of a piston of a combustion-driven working tool

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Antrieb eines Kolbens eines brennkraftbetriebenen Arbeitsgeräts

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif d'actionnement d'un piston pour outil entraîné par combustion

Publication

EP 1093888 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810929 A

Priority

DE 19950345 A

Abstract (en)

The appliance for driving a piston (8) has a combustion chamber (1) divided by a plate (18) possessing through-holes (38) into a preliminary chamber (21) and an main chamber (22), next to the piston. The preliminary chamber contains an ignition device (52) for igniting a combustible gas mixture to produce gas jets passing through the through holes into the main chamber. The lateral distance between the through-holes and the ignition device is set so that the gas volume in the preliminary chamber just provides the pre-determined energy.

Abstract (de)

Zum Antrieb eines Kolbens (8) eines brennkraftbetriebenen Setzgeräts für Befestigungselemente wird in einer Vorkammer (21) ein brennbares Gasgemisch gezündet, um mittels Durchgangsöffnungen (38) in einer Trennplatte (18), die die Vorkammer (21) von einer an den Kolben (8) angrenzenden Hauptkammer (22) trennt, in die Hauptkammer (22) eintretende Gasstrahlen zu erzeugen. Sollen dabei die Gasstrahlen eine vorbestimmte Energie aufweisen, so wird zunächst zu diesem Zweck wenigstens annähernd nur ein dieser vorbestimmten Energie entsprechendes Volumen an brennbarem Gasgemisch in der Vorkammer (21) verbrannt, was zu einer schnelleren Erzeugung der Gasstrahlen beiträgt und zu einer Erhöhung des Wirkungsgrads des gesamten Verbrennungsprozesses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25C 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093888 A2 20010425; EP 1093888 A3 20050406; EP 1093888 B1 20061213; DE 19950345 A1 20010503; DE 19950345 C2 20030605; DE 50013850 D1 20070125; ES 2276668 T3 20070701; JP 2001162561 A 20010619; US 6526926 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151010

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151010

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50013850

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141007

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140911

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2276668

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013850

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-01-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2006-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-11-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOWFIGHI, KAVEH

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI