Global Patent Index - EP 1093896 A2

EP 1093896 A2 2001-04-25 - Strong veneer edging

Title (en)

Strong veneer edging

Title (de)

Starkfurnierkante

Title (fr)

Bordure renforcée en bois de placage

Publication

EP 1093896 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122317 A

Priority

DE 19951035 A

Abstract (en)

The strong wood veneer, for a corner fitting, is in a number of layers. It has at least one outer layer of compressed wood (S1,S2) and at least one glued inner layer (M1-M3) of sheet veneer. An elastic glue layer is between the layers of the veneer structure.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung schafft eine Starkfurnierkante aus Holz, welche einen mehrschichtigen Aufbau aufweist, mit mindestens einer Außenschicht aus Stauchholz (S1, S2) und mindestens einer weiteren damit verleimten Schicht (M1-M3) aus Messerfurnier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27D 5/00; B27D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 1/04 (2006.01); B27D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27D 5/003 (2013.01); B27D 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IE IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093896 A2 20010425; EP 1093896 A3 20050406; DE 19951035 C1 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061006

2005-12-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IE IT PT

2005-11-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI