Global patent index - EP 1093912 A1

EP 1093912 A1 2001-04-25 - Printing machine comprising an object holding device and object lifting devices

Title (en)

Printing machine comprising an object holding device and object lifting devices

Title (de)

Druckmaschine mit einer Vorrichtung zum Halten von Gegenständen und Hebevorrichtungen für Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Machine à imprimer comprenant un support porte-objet et des moyens de soulèvement de l'objet

Publication

EP 1093912 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402793 A

Priority

FR 9913211 A

Abstract (en)

The printer has a plate (11) rotating around its axis and which carries supports (22) for work articles on its periphery. Each support has an upper face (23). Work stations are positioned around the plate. At least one of the supports has a lifter to raise the work above the support face and a suction head (57) to retain the work in position. The lifter has two tubes (43) slidable across openings (41,42) in the support and plate.

Abstract (fr)

Machine à imprimer du genre comportant un plateau (11) monté rotatif autour de son axe et qui porte radialement à la périphérie une pluralité de supports porte-objet (22) ayant une face supérieure (23) de réception de l'objet (30) à imprimer et une pluralité de postes de travail répartis circulairement autour du plateau (11) au droit du trajet des supports porte-objet (22) et dont certains sont des postes d'impression et d'autres des postes de traitement : l'un au moins des supports porte-objet (22) comprend des moyens de soulèvement adaptés à soulever l'objet (30) par rapport à la face supérieure (23) du support porte-objet (22), et reliés à une tête d'aspiration (57) apte à conserver la position en projection de l'objet (30) correspondant à celle qu'il occupait initialement sur le support porte-objet (22) ; selon une forme de réalisation préférée, les moyens de soulèvement sont constitués par deux tubes (43) montés à coulissement au travers de trous traversants (41,42) prévus dans le support porte-objet (22) et dans le plateau (11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/20; B41F 15/08; B41F 15/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/08 (2006.01); B41F 15/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/18 (2013.01); B41F 15/0863 (2013.01); B41P 2215/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093912 A1 20010425; EP 1093912 B1 20040414; DE 60009826 D1 20040519; FR 2800006 A1 20010427; FR 2800006 B1 20020118; US 6546859 B1 20030415

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-10-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-07-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040725

2004-07-15 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60009826

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010417

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI