Global Patent Index - EP 1093919 A2

EP 1093919 A2 2001-04-25 - Ink jet printing head, nozzle plate and manufacturing method thereof

Title (en)

Ink jet printing head, nozzle plate and manufacturing method thereof

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckkopf, Düsenplatte und Herstellungsverfahren dafür

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression à jet d'encre, plaque à orifices et leur procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1093919 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122792 A

Priority

JP 29701599 A

Abstract (en)

A nozzle plate (21) of an ink jet printing head is formed so that its surface facing toward the ink drop discharge direction will have protruding parts (40) around each of its nozzle holes (1). Each protruding part (40) is formed in the shape of a circle that is concentric with a corresponding nozzle hole (1), and the outer edge (41) of the protruding part (40) is formed so as to have an appropriate slope. Due to the configuration of the nozzle plate (21), a wiper blade (30) can make good contact with the surface (protruding parts (40)) of the nozzle plate (21) around the nozzle holes (1) and ink around the nozzle holes (1) can be cleaned successfully in wiping operation, thereby the ink drop discharge properties of the ink jet printing head can be stabilized and improved. Such a configuration of the nozzle plate (21) is realized by electrodeposition without using a photoresist. Therefore, the shape of the nozzle hole (1) is not affected by the coating status of the photoresist, the precision of a patterning image which is used for the exposure and development, the precision and life of a mask, etc. Therefore, the dimensional accuracy (diameter, roundness, etc.) of the nozzle holes (1) can be improved, manufacturing yield of the ink jet printing heads can be increased, manufacturing costs can be reduced, and high quality printing can be realized. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/135 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/162 (2013.01); B41J 2/14274 (2013.01); B41J 2/1625 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H04182134 A 19920629 - SEIKO EPSON CORP

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093919 A2 20010425; EP 1093919 A3 20011010; AU 6653700 A 20010426; CA 2323702 A1 20010419; CN 1293113 A 20010502; JP 2001113698 A 20010424; KR 20010040110 A 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021018

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJI XEROX CO., LTD.

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI