Global Patent Index - EP 1093930 A2

EP 1093930 A2 2001-04-25 - Arrangement for automatic setting of printers and materials therefor

Title (en)

Arrangement for automatic setting of printers and materials therefor

Title (de)

Anordnung zum automatischen Einstellen von drucken und Materialen dafür

Title (fr)

Ensemble pour la configuration automatique d'une imprimante et supports correspondants

Publication

EP 1093930 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203281 A

Priority

  • EP 97934840 A
  • SE 9602934 A

Abstract (en)

The invention concerns an arrangement for the automatic setting of printers, and more particularly the setting of printer parameters by means of code reading, and materials therefor. The parameters concern the printer work parameters, data communication, or printing layout. The code to be read may be applied directly onto the material to be used in the printer, or on separate sheets or labels. With the invention, an optimum setting of the printer (1) is automatically achieved, entailing high quality and making the printer easily usable also by unqualified personnel. The arrangement comprises a printing mechanism (2) and a control unit (3) for achieving a print-out on a printing material by means of a dye. According to the invention, a code reader (4, 5) is connected to the control unit (3) for reading a code for controlling at least one parameter of the printer means. The code may alternatively be associated with the receiver material, the dye, a peripheral device of the printer means, or a printing layout. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 29/393

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 11/46 (2006.01); B41J 29/393 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17546 (2013.01); B41J 11/46 (2013.01); B41J 29/393 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9805508 A1 19980212; AT 242127 T 20030615; DE 69722638 D1 20030710; DE 69722638 T2 20040429; EP 0929403 A1 19990721; EP 0929403 B1 20030604; EP 1093930 A2 20010425; EP 1093930 A3 20020102; SE 508004 C2 19980810; SE 9602934 D0 19960807; SE 9602934 L 19980208

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 929403

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE