Global Patent Index - EP 1093998 A2

EP 1093998 A2 2001-04-25 - Method for the recovery of a person fallen overboard, lifesaving arrangement and apparatus for holding signalling means

Title (en)

Method for the recovery of a person fallen overboard, lifesaving arrangement and apparatus for holding signalling means

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Rettung einer über Bord gefallenen Person, Rettungseinrichtung und Vorrichtung zum Halten eines Signalmittels

Title (fr)

Méthode pour le sauvetage d'un naufragé, dispositif de sauvetage et appareil pour maintenir un signal de repérage

Publication

EP 1093998 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122807 A

Priority

  • DE 19950481 A
  • DE 19957340 A

Abstract (en)

A signal light that is attached to a life saving equipment on a boat, e.g. a life belt, is held by a collar (12) attached to the mounting bracket (11). The collar is closed by a safety catch attached to the dragline (57) connected to the life saving equipment. The dragline is also attached to the signal light. The light is held upside down by the clamp, with the clamp gripping completely around the light. The clamp has hinged sections to enable it to open rapidly and release the light.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Halten eines Signalmittels (10), insbesondere an Bord von Schiffen, mit mindestens einem das Signalmittel (10) fixierenden Halteorgan. Erfindungsgemäß weist das Halteorgan einen mindestens einen Abschnitt des Signalmittels (10) vollständig umgreifenden Haltekragen (12) auf, der aus wenigstens zwei durch einen lösbaren Verschluss (50) zusammengehaltenen Haltekragenteilen gebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63C 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/00 (2006.01); B63C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63C 9/0005 (2013.01); B63C 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093998 A2 20010425; EP 1093998 A3 20030108; EP 1093998 B1 20041222; ES 2233268 T3 20050616

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161011

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131020

2014-11-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141107

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131019

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131019

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121017

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CHEMRING MARINE GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CHEMRING DEFENCE GERMANY GMBH, 27574 BREMERHAVEN, DE

- Document: DE 50009008

- Effective date: 20120827

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50009008

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER ANWALTSSOZIETAET GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20120827

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50009008

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20120827

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50009008

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20120827

2012-10-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120906 AND 20120912

2012-09-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: CHEMRING MARINE GERMANY GMBH

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-08-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50009008

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER ANWALTSSOZIETAET GBR, DE

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233268 T3

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-04-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009008 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB SE

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB SE

2003-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 63C 9/22 A, 7B 63C 9/00 B

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOTHE, THORSTEN

2001-05-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIX, ERNST

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI