Global Patent Index - EP 1094003 A1

EP 1094003 A1 2001-04-25 - Device for closing filled containers with a closing stopper

Title (en)

Device for closing filled containers with a closing stopper

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verschliessen von mit einem Füllgut befüllten Behältern mit Verschlussstopfen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fermer des récipients remplis, avec un bouchon de fermeture

Publication

EP 1094003 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121626 A

Priority

DE 29918679 U

Abstract (en)

The arrangement includes a fastener plug, and an evacuation arrangement (13) connected by means of a vacuum conductor (31) with a vacuum source (30) and in sealed contact with an upper side of the containers for evacuating a container headroom. The vacuum conductor is connectable with a cleaning- and/or sterilization medium source (63,64,65) for cleaning and sterilizing the evacuation arrangement and parts (32,34) of the vacuum conductor. The evacuation arrangement is connectable with an outlet arrangement (67) for the cleaning- and/or sterilization medium, so that a flow path is formed through parts of the vacuum conductor and the evacuation arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Eine in einem Gehäuse (10) einer Verpackungsmaschine angeordnete Verschlußvorrichtung (12) dient zum Verschließen von Spritzenkörpern (1) mit Verschlußstopfen (4). Die Verschlußvorrichtung (12) weist ein Evakuierwerkzeug (13), eine Zuführeinrichtung (37) für die Verschlußstopfen (4) und eine Evakuier- und Führungseinrichtung (45) für Eindrückstößel (48) auf. Um die Verschlußvorrichtung (12) und Teile ihrer Vakuumverrohrung (31) vor der Inbetriebnahme oder nach Produktionspausen reinigen bzw. sterilisieren zu können ist ein Sammelblock (67) vorgesehen. Der Sammelblock (67) ist an das Evakuierwerkzeug (13) anschließbar. Ferner ist die Vakuumleitung (31) mit Reinigungs- bzw. Sterilisiermittelquellen (63, 64, 65) verbindbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 3/00; B65B 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/00 (2006.01); B65B 7/28 (2006.01); B65B 55/02 (2006.01); B67B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 55/02 (2013.01); B65B 3/006 (2013.01); B65B 7/2821 (2013.01); B65B 2210/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29918679 U1 20010301; EP 1094003 A1 20010425; EP 1094003 B1 20030129; JP 2001171791 A 20010626; JP 4939684 B2 20120530

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061004

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2005-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001161 P 20030306

2003-02-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI