Global patent index - EP 1094015 A1

EP 1094015 A1 2001-04-25 - Combination of a jigsaw puzzle and a container

Title (en)

Combination of a jigsaw puzzle and a container

Title (de)

Behälter-Puzzle Kombination

Title (fr)

Combinaison d'un récipient et d'un puzzle

Publication

EP 1094015 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00122897 A

Priority

IT TO990191 U

Abstract (en)

The combination of a jigsaw puzzle and a container wherein a tubular metal container (2) contains a number of pieces (3) that can be fitted together, and has an outer surface (4) on which graphics and pictures (10) are imprinted stably. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/00 (2006.01); A63F 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/00 (2013.01); A63F 9/10 (2013.01); B65D 2203/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094015 A1 20010425; IT TO990191 U1 20010423; IT TO990191 V0 19991022

INPADOC legal status

2007-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070328

2005-07-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEOGRAMMA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI