Global Patent Index - EP 1094023 A2

EP 1094023 A2 2001-04-25 - Sheet guiding device for machines processing printed sheets

Title (en)

Sheet guiding device for machines processing printed sheets

Title (de)

Bogenleiteinrichtung für Bedruckstoffbögen verarbeitende Maschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage de feuilles pour machines à travailler des feuilles imprimées

Publication

EP 1094023 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105378 A

Priority

DE 19950408 A

Abstract (en)

The sheet guide has a first guide element (64) with a supporting surface (46) for supporting lateral edges of sheets (44) inclined transversely with respect to the sheet transport direction and adjustable by an adjuster (69) with a motor (52) for moving the adjuster. The motor is connected to the first guide element via a threaded transmission (54). The supporting surface is curved transversely to the transport direction. Independent claims are also included for the following: a machine for processing sheet print material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Bogenleiteinrichtung (32; 38) für Bedruckstoffbögen (44) verarbeitende Maschinen (22), mit einem ersten Leitelement (39; 64) das eine quer zur Transportrichtung der Bedruckstoffbögen (44) geneigte Stützfläche (46) für Seitenkanten (42) der Bedruckstoffbögen (44) aufweist und welches mittels einer Verstelleinrichtung (48; 69) verstellbar gelagert ist. Die erfindungsgemäße Bogenleiteinrichtung (32; 38) zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Verstelleinrichtung (48; 69) einen das erste Leitelement (39; 64) verstehenden Motors (52; 70) umfaßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/52; B41F 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/38 (2006.01); B65H 9/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/52 (2013.01); B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B65H 2404/512 (2013.01); B65H 2404/61 (2013.01); B65H 2406/11 (2013.01); B65H 2701/132 (2013.01); B65H 2701/176 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094023 A2 20010425; EP 1094023 A3 20021127; DE 19950408 A1 20010503; JP 2001158079 A 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI