Global Patent Index - EP 1094024 A1

EP 1094024 A1 2001-04-25 - Security system for elevator plant

Title (en)

Security system for elevator plant

Title (de)

Sicherheitssystem für Aufzugsanlagen

Title (fr)

Système de sécurité pour installation d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 1094024 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810945 A

Priority

EP 99810945 A

Abstract (en)

The system has at least one sensor (6) for detecting risk objects or persons that measures signals and passes them to an evaluation unit (7) that evaluates the signals in accordance with sensor-specific characteristics and initiates safety measures. The sensor is mounted in an elevator cabin and/or near a cabin and/or in the elevator shaft. It is a metal detector for detecting weapons and/or a particle and gas analyzer with a camera. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method of operating a safety system.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Sicherheitssystem für eine Aufzugsanlage (1), das Sicherheitssystem ist mit mindestens einem Sensor (6) zum Erfassen von Risikogütern bzw. Risikopersonen ausgestattet, welcher mindestens eine Sensor (6) Signale misst und an eine Auswerteeinheit (7) weiterleitet, welche Auswerteeinheit (7) diese Signale gemäss sensorspezifischer Kenngrössen auswertet und Sicherheitsmassnahmen einleitet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/0012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 4460066 A 19840717 - OHTA KAZUTOSHI [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 527 (M - 1484) 22 September 1993 (1993-09-22)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 04 30 April 1999 (1999-04-30)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 13 30 November 1999 (1999-11-30)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 03 27 February 1998 (1998-02-27)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 08 30 June 1999 (1999-06-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094024 A1 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI