Global Patent Index - EP 1094027 A1

EP 1094027 A1 2001-04-25 - High pressure pneumatic beverage dispensing system

Title (en)

High pressure pneumatic beverage dispensing system

Title (de)

Mit Hochdruck betriebener pneumatischer Getränkespender

Title (fr)

Distributeur de boissons pneumatique à pression surélevée

Publication

EP 1094027 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120677 A

Priority

EP 99120677 A

Abstract (en)

The present disclosure relates to a self-contained high pressure pneumatic beverage dispensing system. In one embodiment, the system comprises a carbonator tank for facilitating absorption of CO2 gas in water to produce carbonated water, a refillable source of CO2 gas under high pressure, the source of CO2 gas in fluid communication with the carbonator tank so as to fill the carbonator tank with CO2 gas, a source of water under high pressure and in fluid communication with the carbonator tank so as to fill the carbonator tank with water, at least one pneumatic pump in fluid communication with the source of CO2 gas, at least one liquid reservoir, for example a bag-in-box container, in fluid communication with the at least one pneumatic pump, and a beverage dispenser valve in fluid communication with the carbonator tank and the at least one liquid reservoir, wherein the beverage dispenser valve can dispense carbonated water and/or the liquid held in the at least one liquid reservoir when activated by the operator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/00; B67D 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/00 (2006.01); B67D 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/006 (2013.01); B67D 1/0057 (2013.01); B67D 1/103 (2013.01); B67D 2001/0827 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094027 A1 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030823

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030410

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI