Global patent index - EP 1094028 A1

EP 1094028 A1 2001-04-25 - Method and device for identifying automatically vehicles for fueling purposes

Title (en)

Method and device for identifying automatically vehicles for fueling purposes

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur automatischen Fahrzeugerkennung beim Tanken

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la reconnaissance automatique de véhicules lors du remplissage du réservoir d'essence

Publication

EP 1094028 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810961 A

Priority

EP 99810961 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves transferring data stored in a vehicle memory unit for establishing authorization to refuel and controlling release of the petrol pump to a check system. Filler valve identification data stored near the filler valve are passed to the memory unit when the filler is inserted into the tank connector and passed from the memory unit with vehicle identification data to a monitoring system for authorization and petrol pump release. The method involves transferring data stored in a memory unit in the vehicle for establishing authorization to refuel and for controlling the release of the petrol pump (14) to a check system. Filler valve (20) identification data stored near the filler valve are passed to the memory unit when the filler is inserted into the tank's filling connector and passed from the memory unit (28) together with vehicle identification data to a monitoring system (16) for authorization and to release the petrol pump. Independent claims are also included for the following: a system for automatic vehicle identification.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur automatischen Erkennung eines Fahrzeuges (12) und Steuerung der Freigabe einer Tanksäule (14) zum Einfüllen von Treibstoff mittels eines Zapfventiles (20) durch den Einfüllstutzen (26) in den Treibstofftank (24) des Fahrzeuges (12) werden im Fahrzeug (12) in einer Speichereinheit (28) gespeicherte Fahrzeugkenndaten zur Feststellung der Berechtigung zum Tanken und Steuerung der Freigabe der Tanksäule (14) an ein Überprüfungssystem (16) übermittelt. Im Bereich des Zapfventiles (20) in einen Transponder (40) gespeicherte Zapfventilkenndaten werden beim Einsetzen des Zapfventiles (20) in den Tankeinfüllstutzen (26) von einer Antenne (38) gelesen und an die Speichereinheit (28) und von der Speichereinheit (28) zusammen mit den Fahrzeugkenndaten an das Überprüfungssystem (16) zur Fahrzeugidentifikation und Freigabesteuerung der Tanksäule (14) übermittelt. Durch die Übermittlung sämtlicher Kenndaten von der im Fahrzeug angeordneten Speichereinheit (28) an das Überprüfungssystem (16) entfällt der bei Systemen nach dem Stand der Technik übliche Datentransfer über eine dem Zapfschlauch entlang geführte, gegen mechanische Beschädigung anfällige Kabelverbindung, wodurch die Störanfälligkeit des Betankungssystems wesentlich erniedrigt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/14; B67D 5/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/14 (2010.01); B67D 7/34 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/145 (2013.01); B67D 7/348 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094028 A1 20010425; AT 271521 T 20040815; AU 7638800 A 20010508; DE 50007149 D1 20040826; EP 1222137 A1 20020717; EP 1222137 B1 20040721; WO 0130687 A1 20010503

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FORSTER, STEFAN

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI