Global Patent Index - EP 1094078 A3

EP 1094078 A3 2001-05-02 - Stable polymerized hemoglobin blood-substitute

Title (en)

Stable polymerized hemoglobin blood-substitute

Title (de)

Stabiles Blutersatzmittel mit polymerisiertem Hämoglobin

Title (fr)

Succédané de sang stable à base d' hémoglobine polymérisée

Publication

EP 1094078 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00204276 A

Priority

  • EP 96909855 A
  • US 40933795 A
  • US 45891695 A
  • US 47158395 A
  • US 47349795 A
  • US 47800495 A
  • US 48477595 A
  • US 48728895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9629346A1] A method for producing a stable polymerized hemoglobin blood-substitute from blood characterized in the use of a chromatographic column, is disclosed. The method of this invention includes mixing blood with an anticoagulant to form a blood solution, washing the red blood cells in the blood solution and then separating the washed red blood cells from the white blood cells. This method also includes disrupting the red blood cells to release hemoglobin and form a hemoglobin solution, which is then treated by high performance liquid chromatography to form a hemoglobin eluate. The hemoglobin eluate is then deoxygenated, contacted with a first reducing agent to form an oxidation-stabilized deoxygenated hemoglobin solution, and mixed with a cross-linking agent to form a polymerization reaction mixture, which is then polymerized. The polymerized hemoglobin solution is then diafiltered with a physiologic solution and with a reducing agent, whereby the polymerized hemoglobin solution is made physiologically acceptable, and whereby the reducing agent scavenges oxygen, to form a stable polymerized hemoglobin blood-substitute, which is then packaged and stored in an atmopshere substantially free of oxygen. Compositions made by the methods are also disclosed, as are methods of therapeutically, or prophylactically, treating a vertebrate to increase tissue oxygenation, or prevent oxygen depletion, in tissue of the vertebrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/805; A61K 38/42; A61P 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A01N 1/02 (2006.01); A61K 35/14 (2006.01); A61K 38/42 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 7/08 (2006.01); B32B 15/08 (2006.01); B32B 27/08 (2006.01); C07K 1/18 (2006.01); C07K 14/805 (2006.01); A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 15/09 (2013.01); A01N 1/02 (2013.01); A01N 1/0226 (2013.01); A61K 38/42 (2013.01); B32B 15/08 (2013.01); B32B 15/085 (2013.01); B32B 15/088 (2013.01); B32B 15/20 (2013.01); B32B 27/08 (2013.01); B32B 27/32 (2013.01); B32B 27/34 (2013.01); B32B 27/36 (2013.01); C07K 14/805 (2013.01); A61J 1/05 (2013.01); B32B 2311/04 (2013.01); B32B 2311/08 (2013.01); B32B 2311/24 (2013.01); B32B 2323/10 (2013.01); B32B 2367/00 (2013.01); B32B 2377/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] WO 8912456 A1 19891228 - BAXTER INT [US]
  • [PY] WO 9526195 A1 19951005 - BAXTER INT [US]
  • [DA] WO 8803408 A1 19880519 - BIOPURE CORP [US]
  • [Y] DATABASE BIOSIS [online] BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US; 1993, COLE DANIEL J ET AL: "Focal cerebral ischemia in rats: Effect of hypervolemic hemodilution with diaspirin cross-linked hemoglobin versus albumin on brain injury and edema.", XP002161493, Database accession no. PREV199395133717 & ANESTHESIOLOGY (HAGERSTOWN), vol. 78, no. 2, 1993, pages 335 - 342, ISSN: 0003-3022ANESTHESIOLOGY (HAGERSTOWN)19937820003-3022335342

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9629346 A1 19960926; AT 222926 T 20020915; AT 447324 T 20091115; AU 5322796 A 19961008; AU 705225 B2 19990520; CA 2215697 A1 19960926; CA 2215697 C 20090818; DE 69623267 D1 20021002; DE 69623267 T2 20030417; DK 0815138 T3 20021223; EP 0815138 A1 19980107; EP 0815138 B1 20020828; EP 1093720 A1 20010425; EP 1093720 B1 20091104; EP 1094078 A2 20010425; EP 1094078 A3 20010502; EP 1094079 A2 20010425; EP 1094079 A3 20010502; EP 1211261 A2 20020605; EP 1211261 A3 20040317; ES 2179188 T3 20030116; JP 2007260393 A 20071011; JP 4382877 B2 20091216; JP H11502821 A 19990309; NZ 305258 A 20001027; PT 815138 E 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111001

2009-10-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036075

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 815138

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE