Global Patent Index - EP 1094106 A1

EP 1094106 A1 2001-04-25 - Cleaning composition

Title (en)

Cleaning composition

Title (de)

Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1094106 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870217 A

Priority

EP 99870217 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a bleaching composition comprising a bleaching agent and a chromotropic radical scavenging compound. In an alternative embodiment the present invention relates to a test method for identifying the presence of free radicals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/26; C11D 3/395; C11D 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/26 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/395 (2006.01); C11D 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0084 (2013.01); C11D 3/26 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 3/3945 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 3/3953 (2013.01); C11D 3/3956 (2013.01); C11D 3/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DXA] WO 9719054 A1 19970529 - UNIV FLORIDA INT [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094106 A1 20010425; AT 241689 T 20030615; AU 1212901 A 20010430; DE 60003059 D1 20030703; DE 60003059 T2 20040408; EP 1222243 A1 20020717; EP 1222243 B1 20030528; ES 2199877 T3 20040301; WO 0129165 A1 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030729

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010915

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI