Global Patent Index - EP 1094123 A1

EP 1094123 A1 2001-04-25 - Electrode weighing stub

Title (en)

Electrode weighing stub

Title (de)

Elektrodenaufhängung mit Wiegeeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Suspension pour électrodes avec dispositif de pesage

Publication

EP 1094123 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308218 A

Priority

EP 99308218 A

Abstract (en)

A consumable electrode (14) is suspended by a stub (12). The stub includes upper and lower hangers (40,42) between which is vertically mounted a loadcell (44) for weighing the electrode attached to the lower hanger. An electrical conductor (46) is joined between the upper and lower hangers for carrying electrical current herebetween to power the electrode without damaging the loadcell. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 9/00; F27D 11/08; H05B 7/102

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/18 (2006.01); H05B 7/102 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/18 (2013.01); H05B 7/102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094123 A1 20010425; EP 1094123 B1 20050713; DE 69926129 D1 20050818; DE 69926129 T2 20060511

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151018

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151018

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69926129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141027

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69926129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MAI DOERR BESIER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060418

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69926129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI