Global patent index - EP 1094124 A2

EP 1094124 A2 2001-04-25 - Super clean steel

Title (en)

Super clean steel

Title (de)

Ultrareiner Stahl

Title (fr)

Acier superpurifié

Publication

EP 1094124 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00850090 A

Priority

SE 9903736 A

Abstract (en)

A super clean steel for use in objects subjected to heavy loads in all directions, such as in fuel injection pumps or bearings, comprising, in weight, O max. 7 ppm, Ti max. 15 ppm, and S between about 8 ppm and about 12 ppm, and having a K1(total) value according to DIN 50 602 of below 2.5. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/445 (2013.01); C22C 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094124 A2 20010425; EP 1094124 A3 20010509; SE 515146 C2 20010618; SE 9903736 D0 19991018; SE 9903736 L 20010419

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020816

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI