Global Patent Index - EP 1094124 A3

EP 1094124 A3 2001-05-09 - Super clean steel

Title (en)

Super clean steel

Title (de)

Ultrareiner Stahl

Title (fr)

Acier superpurifié

Publication

EP 1094124 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00850090 A

Priority

SE 9903736 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1094124A2] A super clean steel for use in objects subjected to heavy loads in all directions, such as in fuel injection pumps or bearings, comprising, in weight, O max. 7 ppm, Ti max. 15 ppm, and S between about 8 ppm and about 12 ppm, and having a K1(total) value according to DIN 50 602 of below 2.5. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/445 (2013.01); C22C 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 100 (C - 0693) 23 February 1990 (1990-02-23)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 262 (C - 442) 25 August 1987 (1987-08-25)
  • [X] DATABASE COMPENDEX [online] ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US; UESUGI TOSHIKAZU: "PRODUCTION OF HIGH CARBON CHROMIUM BEARING STEEL BY VERTICAL TYPE CONTINUOUS CASTER", XP002160792, Database accession no. EIX85120183378 & TETSU TO HAGANE OCT 1985, vol. 71, no. 14, October 1985 (1985-10-01), pages 1631 - 1638, XP002160790TETSU TO HAGANE OCT 1985198510711416311638
  • [A] LUND, TB, ÖLUND, L J P: "IMPROVING PRODUCTION, CONTROL AND PROPERTIES OF BEARING STEELS INTENDED FOR DEMANDING APPLICATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF "ADVANCES IN THE PRODUCTION AND USE OF STEEL WITH IMPROVED INTERNAL CLEANLINESS" (4-7 MAY 1998), January 1999 (1999-01-01), pages 32 - 48, XP002160791

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094124 A2 20010425; EP 1094124 A3 20010509; SE 515146 C2 20010618; SE 9903736 D0 19991018; SE 9903736 L 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020816

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI