Global Patent Index - EP 1094126 A1

EP 1094126 A1 2001-04-25 - ATMOSPHERIC CORROSION RESISTANT STEEL PRODUCT

Title (en)

ATMOSPHERIC CORROSION RESISTANT STEEL PRODUCT

Title (de)

STAHLPRODUKT, RESISTENT GEGEN ATMOSPHÄRISCHE KORROSION

Title (fr)

PRODUIT EN ACIER RESISTANT A LA CORROSION ATMOSPHERIQUE

Publication

EP 1094126 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00915415 A

Priority

  • JP 0002274 W
  • JP 10174399 A
  • JP 10763999 A

Abstract (en)

A steel material excellent in weathering resistance by defining the chemical ingredients in the steel each to a predetermined range and setting an ingredient parameter formula in accordance with the working circumstance thereby reducing the flow rust and, particularly, forming stable rust with good protective property even in a salty circumstance such as in coast districts is provided. Further, also considering the amount of A type inclusions and B type inclusions according to JIS G 0555, a steel material of excellent earthquake proofness and weathering proofness also including weld heat affect zone is provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/08 (2006.01); C22C 38/16 (2006.01); C22C 38/20 (2006.01); C22C 38/32 (2006.01); C22C 38/38 (2006.01); C22C 38/42 (2006.01); C22C 38/52 (2006.01); C22C 38/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/08 (2013.01); C22C 38/16 (2013.01); C22C 38/20 (2013.01); C22C 38/32 (2013.01); C22C 38/38 (2013.01); C22C 38/42 (2013.01); C22C 38/52 (2013.01); C22C 38/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094126 A1 20010425; EP 1094126 A4 20030305; AU 3673600 A 20001114; AU 768461 B2 20031211; CA 2333526 A1 20001019; WO 0061829 A1 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040120

2003-12-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JFE STEEL CORPORATION

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-03-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/04 A

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/16 B

2003-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 22C 38/00 B

2001-08-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 38/58 A, 7C 22C 38/04 B, 7C 22C 38/16 B, 7C 22C 38/54 B

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE