Global Patent Index - EP 1094136 A1

EP 1094136 A1 2001-04-25 - Heat-retaining fiber and fabrics and the method for making the same

Title (en)

Heat-retaining fiber and fabrics and the method for making the same

Title (de)

Wärmehaltendes Faser- und Textilflächengebilde und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Fibre et matériau textiles retenant la chaleur et leur procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1094136 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121166 A

Priority

EP 99121166 A

Abstract (en)

The heat-retaining fiber and fabrics and the method therefor are disclosed. According to the present invention, the white conductive particles and the white particles with good radiating efficiency of far-infrared radiation are added in fiber-forming polymers to obtain the mixed composition. The fiber and fabrics made of the mixed composition is characteristic of excellent effect of heat-retaining usable for the use of requiring good heat-retaining effectiveness. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 1/10; D01F 6/62; D01F 8/04; D01F 8/12; D01F 8/14; D01D 5/253

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/253 (2006.01); D01F 1/10 (2006.01); D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D01F 8/04 (2006.01); D01F 8/12 (2006.01); D01F 8/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/253 (2013.01); D01F 1/10 (2013.01); D01F 6/62 (2013.01); D01F 8/04 (2013.01); D01F 8/12 (2013.01); D01F 8/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0302141 A2 19890208 - DESCENTE LTD [JP]
  • [A] DATABASE CHEMABS [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; SUGIMOTO, TETSUYA ET AL: "Heat-retaining core-sheath fibers with improved whiteness", XP002133394, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 115:73552 & JP H0351312 A 19910305 - UNITIKA LTD
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 490 (C - 1249) 13 September 1994 (1994-09-13)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 283 (C - 612) 28 June 1989 (1989-06-28)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094136 A1 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040205

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI