Global Patent Index - EP 1094137 A1

EP 1094137 A1 2001-04-25 - Polyester fibres with reduced tendency to pilling formation and method for producing them

Title (en)

Polyester fibres with reduced tendency to pilling formation and method for producing them

Title (de)

Polyesterfasern mit verminderter Pillingneigung sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Fibres de polyester avec tendance réduite au boulochage et leur procédé de production

Publication

EP 1094137 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121979 A

Priority

DE 19951067 A

Abstract (en)

A new polyester fiber comprises: (i) fiber forming polymer containing at least 90 mol.% polyethylene terephthalate; (ii) a diol from (di)ethylene and triethylene glycol; (iii) 0.003 - 1.0 wt.% finely dispersed silicon dioxide or silicic acid particles; (iv) 0.003 - 2.0 wt.% silicon oil; and (v) optionally conventional additives. The diol is in an amount to give the polyester fiber a relative viscosity of 1.37 - 1.58 in 1 % cresol. An Independent claim is also included for the preparation of the fiber by mixing, melting and spinning the components.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft pillingresistente oder pillarme Polyesterfasern, die einen Polyester als fadenbildendes Polymer enthalten, das aus mindestens 90 Mol.-% Polyethylenterephtalat-Einheiten besteht, sowie ein aliphatisches oder alicyclisches Diol in einer Menge, um den Polyester auf eine relative Viskosität im Bereich von 1,37 - 1,58 (gemessen 1%-ig in m-Kresol) abzubauen, 0,003 bis 1,0 Gew.-% in dem Polyestermaterial fein verteilte Siliciumdioxid- oder Kieselsäure-Teilchen, bezogen auf das fadenbildende Polymere, und 0,003 bis 2,0 Gew.-% Siliconöl, bezogen auf das fadenbildende Polymere, wobei im Fall von im Siliconöl vorhandenen reaktiven Gruppen diese mindestens teilweise chemisch an die Polyester-Makromoleküle gebunden sind.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/62; D01F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 1/10 (2006.01); D01F 6/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 1/10 (2013.01); D01F 6/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094137 A1 20010425; EP 1094137 B1 20030402; CN 1302923 A 20010711; DE 19951067 A1 20010523; DE 19951067 B4 20040408; ID 27708 A 20010426; TR 200003080 A1 20010521

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091009

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INVENTA-FISCHER AG

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001598 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010822

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI