Global Patent Index - EP 1094139 A1

EP 1094139 A1 2001-04-25 - Slider needle with asymmetrical formed slider

Title (en)

Slider needle with asymmetrical formed slider

Title (de)

Schiebernadel mit asymmetrisch geteiltem schieber

Title (fr)

Aiguille à coulisse asymmétrique

Publication

EP 1094139 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00122042 A

Priority

DE 19950259 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19950259C1] The compound needle (1) for a knitter has a slide (3) which rides longitudinally in a slide channel (7) in the needle body (2). Two slide springs (22,23), through the channel (7), are asymmetric to each other at least in their sections within the channel (7). At least one slide spring (22,23) has at least one recessed section which, in operation, is at least temporarily in the open zone (15) of the channel (7). Or both slide springs (22,23) have recesses, pref. at different points. The recesses overlap at least partially. The slide springs (22,23) are held at a slide body (3) at a mounting point, with web sections extending longitudinally from the mounting to transit into a guide section. The web sections do not overlap, and the spring guide sections are offset against each other in relation to the longitudinal line. The slide springs (22,23) have projections to hold the stitches where their structures are asymmetric to each other. The slide springs can be arranged without an overlap, with their asymmetric sections mainly within the channel. At least one side wall (8,9) of the slide channel in the needle body (2) has at least one opening (15) for the removal of collected debris in the knitter needle channels. The opening (15) can be in the base of the slide channel (7) for the removal of foreign matter from the needle channels. Each slide spring has upper and lower laying surfaces, at equal gaps. The slide springs (22,23) are higher than the walls of the channel, with the upper laying surfaces projecting over the channel walls (8,9).

Abstract (de)

Eine Schiebernadel (1) weist einen Schieber (3) auf, der zwei Schieberfedern (22,23) aufweist. Diese sind zueinander asymmetrisch ausgebildet oder wenigstens mit Öffnungen oder Aussparungen versehen, die bei Betrieb der Schiebernadel mit einer entsprechenden Aussparung oder sonstigen Öffnungen in dem Grundkörper der Schiebernadel in Übereinstimmung gebracht werden, so dass Ablagerungen in den Nadelkanal abgeführt werden können. Eine asymmetrische Ausbildung der Schieberfedern (22,23) verhindert ein Festklemmen des Schiebers (3) in dem Schieberkanal (7), auch dann, wenn Ablagerungen nur unvollständig entfernt werden, was den Verschleiss der Schiebernadel wesentlich vermindert und die Betriebssicherheit erhöht.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/06 (2006.01); D04B 35/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/32 (2013.01); D04B 35/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19950259 C1 20010125; DE 50012284 D1 20060427; EP 1094139 A1 20010425; EP 1094139 B1 20060301; ES 2255930 T3 20060716; JP 2001140148 A 20010522; JP 4056690 B2 20080305; US 6339942 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161005

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160915

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255930 T3

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012284 P 20060427

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031208

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010526

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI