Global Patent Index - EP 1094152 A2

EP 1094152 A2 2001-04-25 - Twin-wire former

Title (en)

Twin-wire former

Title (de)

Doppelsiebformer

Title (fr)

Section de formage à deux toiles

Publication

EP 1094152 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116922 A

Priority

DE 19950806 A

Abstract (en)

A former with two wire screen belts (14, 16) has a continuous support belt (22) running inside the screen (14) that is not in contact with the forming roll (20). Additional tension in the support belt (22) compensates for centrifugal forces acting on the inner screen (16) and the stock suspension (12'). The support belt (22) can be profiled or have blind or through holes.

Abstract (de)

Ein Doppelsiebformer (10) einer Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn (12) wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn umfaßt zwei umlaufende endlose Siebe (14, 16), die unter Bildung eines Stoffeinlaufspaltes (18) zusammenlaufen, wobei im Bereich des Stoffeinlaufspaltes (18) eines (16) der beiden Siebe (14, 16) über ein Formierelement (20) wie insbesondere eine Formierwalze oder ein durch Leisten abgestütztes Formierband geführt ist. Das nicht mit dem Formierelement (20) in Kontakt tretende Außensieb (14) ist im Bereich des Formierelements (20) durch ein innerhalb der Außensiebschlaufe angeordnetes umlaufendes endloses Stützband (22) abgestützt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094152 A2 20010425; EP 1094152 A3 20010905; DE 19950806 A1 20010426

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031219

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI IT

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI