Global patent index - EP 1094156 A1

EP 1094156 A1 2001-04-25 - Method and apparatus for confining a bituminous road covering around a rail

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for confining a bituminous road covering around a rail

Title (de)

Rückhaltungsverfahren und -vorrichtung einer bituminösen Strassendecke in der Nähe einer Schiene

Title (fr)

Procédé de confinement d'enrobés bitumineux au voisinage d'un rail et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1094156 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402824 A

Priority

FR 9912968 A

Abstract (en)

The method of containing bitumen around a tramway rail involves placing a cover formed by two steel side plates (16) connected by at least one cross spacer (17) which engages on the rail. The cover is fixed in place and its lower section placed in an intermediate layer (27). A rolled layer (30) in placed on the intermediate layer up to the top of the frame. The spacer is then removed and a sealing material poured into place.

Abstract (fr)

Suivant ce procédé : (a) on pose sur le rail (1) une coiffe (15) comprenant deux fers plats latéraux (16) reliés par au moins une entretoise transversale (17) qui prend appui sur le rail ; (b) on fixe la position des fers plats et on en incorpore la partie inférieure dans une couche intermédiaire (27); (c) on met en oeuvre sur la couche intermédiaire, jusqu'à un niveau prédéterminé par rapport au bord supérieur des fers plats, une couche de roulement (30); (d) on retire l'entretoise ; et (e) on met en place de chaque côté le joint d'étanchéité (32), notamment par coulée. Application à la réalisation de voies de tramways. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 9/06; E01B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 21/00 (2006.01); E01C 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 21/00 (2013.01); E01C 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DK GB IE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1094156 A1 20010425; FR 2799769 A1 20010420; FR 2799769 B1 20011228; HU 0004056 A2 20010928; HU 0004056 A3 20020128; HU 0004056 D0 20001228; PL 205126 B1 20100331; PL 343289 A1 20010423

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-01 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050406

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DK GB IE LI

2002-01-16 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20011009

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DK GB IE LI

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI